Address used since 01 Aug 2015
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland City, Auckland, 1010 | Office & delivery | 10 Jul 2019 |
Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue , Auckland City , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6 The Concourse, Henderson, Auckland | Registered & physical | 05 Apr 2006 - 30 Sep 2016 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 21 Mar 2001 - 21 Mar 2001 |
1 Selwood Road, Henderson, Auckland | Physical | 21 Mar 2001 - 05 Apr 2006 |
Level 2, 136 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland | Registered | 08 Mar 1998 - 05 Apr 2006 |
136 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland | Registered | 04 Feb 1993 - 08 Mar 1998 |
- | Physical | 18 Feb 1992 - 21 Mar 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lanes Management Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040519302 Entity (NZ Limited Company) | 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue Auckland | 13 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Helsby, Grant Individual | Remuera Auckland 1050 | 25 Jul 1984 - current |
Lane, Gary Rodney Individual | Herne Bay Auckland 1011 | 25 Jul 1984 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clare, Kathryn Ann Individual | Parnell Auckland | 10 Nov 2008 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Antony Brian Hambrook And Kathryn Ann Clare As Trustees Of The Tony Hambrook No.2 Family Trust Other | 26 May 2005 - 11 Jul 2006 | |
Hambrook, A B Individual | The Point, 121 Customs St West Auckland | 25 Jul 1984 - 26 May 2005 |
Hambrook, Kristen Louise Individual | Parnell Auckland | 10 Nov 2008 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Hambrook, Antony Brian Individual | Parnell Auckland | 10 Nov 2008 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Mozart Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038339882 Company Number: 804825 Entity | 25 Jul 1984 - 12 Jul 2017 | |
Hambrook, Kristen Louise Individual | Parnell Auckland | 01 Dec 2009 - 13 Mar 2015 |
Null - Antony Brian Hambrook, Kathryn Ann Clare And Kristen Louise Hambrook As Trustees Of The Tony Hambrook Family Trust Other | 10 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Null - Antony Brian Hambrook And Kathryn Ann Clare As Trustees Of The Tony Hambrook No.2 Family Trust Other | 26 May 2005 - 11 Jul 2006 | |
Mozart Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038339882 Company Number: 804825 Entity | 25 Jul 1984 - 12 Jul 2017 | |
Antony Brian Hambrook, Kathryn Ann Clare And Kristen Louise Hambrook As Trustees Of The Tony Hambrook Family Trust Other | 10 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
| |
| |
| |
| |
| |
|
name | address | Appointed |
---|---|---|
9 Argyle Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 NEW ZEALAND | 4 Mar 1992 | |
87b Premier Avenue, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 NEW ZEALAND | 27 Jun 2017 | |
24 Dromorne Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 NEW ZEALAND | 27 Jun 2017 | |
Apt 1b, 9 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | 4 Mar 1992 - 10 Nov 2008 (resigned) | |
4/119 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 NEW ZEALAND | 4 Mar 1992 - 30 Jun 2017 (resigned) | |
Apt 1b, 9 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 NEW ZEALAND | 10 Nov 2008 - 9 Mar 2016 (resigned) |
Allocation | shares | name | address |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 435,000 (60%) | 9 Argyle Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 NEW ZEALAND | |
1 | 435,000 (60%) | 24 Dromorne Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 NEW ZEALAND | |
2 | 290,000 (40%) | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND |
Name | Status | Incorporated | Address |
---|---|---|---|
Registered | 11 Apr 2000 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 22 May 1979 | Cnr Kordel Place And Accent Dr, East Tamaki NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 11 Aug 2000 | Level Two, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 20 Dec 1979 | Cnr Kordel Place And Accent Dr, East Tamaki NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 24 May 2001 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 23 Aug 2004 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 14 Jul 2005 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 27 Jun 2008 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 24 Jan 1985 | Cnr Kordel Pl And Accent Dr, 4 Kordel Place, East Tamaki, 2163 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 9 Jul 1985 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 28 Jun 2010 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 5 Jul 2010 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 23 Jun 1987 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 24 Jul 1987 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 24 Aug 1988 | Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland NEW ZEALAND |
Name | Status | Incorporated | Address |
---|---|---|---|
Removed | 28 Sep 1916 | Level 17, 34 Shortland St, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 12 Feb 1917 | Anthony Harper, Level 34, 23 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Removed | 8 Dec 1919 | Level 5, 10 Viaduct Harbour Ave, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 6 Mar 1920 | MGI Plus More (Auckland) Limited, Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 15 Apr 1884 | Level 8, 191 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 1 Oct 1908 | Level 5, 136 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 1 Aug 1886 | Level 4, 3 Ferncroft Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
In... | 12 Dec 1902 | McGrathNicol Limited, Level 17 Aig Building, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 23 Nov 1914 | William Buck (NZ) Ltd, Level 4, 21 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 16 May 1921 | 4 Poynton Terrace, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND | |
Registered | 7 Dec 1921 | McQueen & Associates Limited, Floor 4, 165 The Strand, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 NEW ZEALAND |
This site uses cookies. By using our site, and not disabling cookies in your browser, you consent to this. For more info please see our privacy policy. © 2024 CompaniesNZ | Privacy | Terms of Use | Contact Us
The global authority in superyachting
AKIKO is a 34.18 m Motor Yacht, built in New Zealand by Alloy Yachts and delivered in 2007.
Her top speed is 13.5 kn and she boasts a maximum range of 3100.0 nm when navigating at cruising speed, with power coming from two Caterpillar diesel engines. She can accommodate up to 10 guests in 5 staterooms, with 6 crew members waiting on their every need. She has a gross tonnage of 281.0 GT and a 7.78 m beam.
She was designed by Gregory C. Marshall , who also completed the naval architecture. Gregory C. Marshall has designed 51 yachts and created the naval architecture for 20 yachts for yachts above 24 metres.
Her interior was designed by Alloy Yachts , who has 4 other superyacht interiors designed in the BOAT Pro database - she is built with a Teak deck, a Aluminium hull, and Aluminium superstructure.
AKIKO is in the top 30% by LOA in the world. She is one of 2111 motor yachts in the 30-35m size range, and, compared to similarly sized motor yachts, her volume is 94.34 GT above the average.
AKIKO is currently sailing under the Cook Islands flag (along with a total of other 149 yachts). She is currently located at the Australian Marine Complex refit yard, in Australia, where she has been located for 1 month. For more information regarding AKIKO's movements, find out more about BOATPro AIS .
Yachts like this, from our partners, sponsored listings.
IMAGES
COMMENTS
She was delivered in 1985, and her success prompted the local yacht-building team to stay together and found Alloy Yachts, Ltd. One of the original team members, Tony Hambrook, who started as production manager, was named managing director of Alloy Yachts in 1989 and guided the shipyard for the next 27 years.
Loretta Anne. While Alloy Yachts was best known for its super sailers, the New Zealand yard also produced a handful of exquisite motor yachts, including the 47 metre Loretta Anne. Commissioned by a Canadian businesswoman and delivered in May 2012, she went on to win Motor Yacht of the Year at the 2013 World Superyacht Awards.
The Alloy Yachts. For the refined adventurer, yachting remains one of the most luxurious means of transportation - an elevated way to explore and see the world. At Alloy Yachts, we have a generations-old passion for yachting and traveling the high seas, and we like to think that our blog reflects that. Here you'll find yacht reviews ...
Free and open company data on New Zealand company ALLOY YACHTS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (company number 203933), Lina Small, Level 2, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland City, Auckland, 1010
Reset all filters Filters Yacht type Motor Yacht Sail Yacht Yachts for Sale Length (m) 12136 Price Please Choose... € £ $ 200,000230,000,000 Year of Build 18922028 More filters Guests 236 Cabins 118 Choose Broker Builders Exterior Designers Interior Designers Yacht Features Beach Club Cinema Elevator Gym Helipad See more Top Speed (kn) 773 ...
Alloy yachts is recognised as one of the leading superyacht builders in the world and particularly specialises in high quality luxury sailing yachts. Yachts built by Alloy have an international reputation for reliable operation and world class quality.
Vertigo (with that capital "V") is a 220-foot (67.2-meter) ketch that was built right here in Auckland by Alloy Yachts, which had just launched Encore, a smaller, much more traditional 144-footer (43.9-meter) that was docked at the Viaduct Events Centre for her final fit-out and commissioning.
CARYALI is a 41m luxury expedition super yacht built in 2013, refitted in 2015 by Alloy Yachts. View similar yachts for Charter around the world
Alloy Yachts - luxury yacht builder. See all Alloy Yachts yachts in our superyacht catalog.
View Alloy yachts available for charter. Alloy Yachts is a superyacht icon, synonymous with luxury, seaworthiness, engineering excellence and craftsmanship.
Yacht models produced by «Alloy Yachts» became increasingly famous and won awards of various organizations. «Atlanta» won «ShowBoats International 1996" in the category for best interior divine interior design, made of noble wood.
Alloy Yachts is based in New Zealand, and is the shipyard that produced notable yachts such as Vertigo, Tiara and Q. Yachts produced by Alloy have a reputation for their excellent engineering and craftmanship as well as their seaworthiness. The yard's passion for yachting is reflected by award winning vessel standards and a strong international reputation; indeed, the yacht builder has won ...
Alloy Yachts is a luxury yacht builder based in New Zealand providing new building & refit services to the most discerning owners.
Here's the first photo of the completed Hull AY40, a.k.a. Imagine, from Alloy Yachts. The delivery obviously marks a special occasion, but it's extra special for another reason. Imagine is being handed over 17 years after the yard delivered a smaller sister, with the same name, to the same owner.
Alloy Yachts are launched from the largest international superyacht builder in New Zealand. The company has been in business since 1984 and builds custom yachts ranging from 100 feet to 190 feet in length. Alloy Yachts is one of a small group of international yacht builders offering a wide variety of custom components that are manufactured in-house, specifically for their yachts. Aluminum is ...
DESTINATION is a 41m superyacht built by Alloy Yachts in New Zealand and delivered in 2002. Explore her photos and specifications here.
Alloy Yachts International Limited used more aliases, namely: Markline Boat Sales Limited from 25 Jul 1984 to 06 Aug 1987. 725000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 290000 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
3. Coverage Knowing if your yacht is covered anywhere is good information to have when getting insurance. You need to check your insurance policy to see if your yacht will be covered should you roam from American waters. Typically, this is only an issue when dealing with international waters like Mexico and Canada.
ENCORE is a 43.9m superyacht built by Alloy Yachts and available for sale with Moravia Yachting right now. Explore her today.
Overview ALLOY YACHTS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED is a NZ Limited Company from Auckland in NEW ZEALAND. It was incorporated on 25 Jul 1984 and has the status: Registered.
ENCORE is a 43.9m superyacht built by Alloy Yachts in New Zealand and delivered in 2013. Explore her photos and specifications here.
AKIKO is a 34.18m superyacht built by Alloy Yachts in New Zealand and delivered in 2007. Explore her photos and specifications here.